judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID L. WOODWARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1282
Short Caption:DAVID L. WOODWARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead:10-CM-1282Consolidated: 10-CM-1283
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD11799-10Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/22/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/03/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid L. Woodward Y
Daniel K. DorseyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/18/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Daniel Dorsey, Esquire
11/02/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CM-1282 and 10-CM-1283 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Daniel Dorsey, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in these appeals nunc pro tunc to October 18, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court records and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to these appeals have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for these appeals has been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the records on appeals. (By: JAC)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (129pgs/Tape) 10/4/10 proc. w/CD
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
11/23/2010RECORD INDEX (10CM1283)
11/23/2010RECORD COPIES (10CM1283)
12/01/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
01/11/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief and Appendix
01/20/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of thsi order. (By: JAC)
01/20/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/20/2011APPENDIX
01/25/2011RECORD INDEX (10CM1282)
01/25/2011RECORD COPIES (10CM1282)
02/22/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
02/22/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/30/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/30/2011SUBMITTED before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Fisher and Farrell
07/11/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/03/2011FiledMandate