judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-3695
B-3695
11/29/1972
Application for Writ of Error
HARTZELL PROPELLER COMPANY, INC.
BARBARA NAN DICK ALEXANDER, ET AL., DALLAS AERO SERVICE, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/08/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/15/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
12/13/1972Response to PetitionRespondent
11/29/1972Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/12/1973Response to Motion filed
03/08/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/15/1972Response to Petition
12/13/1972Response to Petition
11/29/1972Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/29/1972Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas Aero Service, Inc.Respondent
Barbara Nan Dick Alexander, et al.Respondent
Hartzell Propeller Company, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information