judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUGHES (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 62018
Short Caption:HUGHES (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 59714 , 62019
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C214506Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/01/2012Filing FeeAppeal Filing fee waived. Criminal.
11/01/2012Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 12-34556
11/15/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP12-MD/MG/RP 12-36320
12/14/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-39596
12/14/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
12/27/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 20, 2012. 12-39596