Case Information: 58209 | |||
Short Caption: | HOGUE (STEVEN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 56978 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249294 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/22/2011 | Filing Fee | Appeal Filing fee waived. Criminal. | ||
04/22/2011 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. HOGUE - C249294 | 11-11966 | |
05/11/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." | 11-14036 | |
06/09/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-17077 | |
06/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
06/22/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 15, 2011. | 11-17077 |