judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WOODSIDE (GEORGE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38241
Short Caption:WOODSIDE (GEORGE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010497Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12700
07/30/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-12786
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from counsel for appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. 01-13759
09/06/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. 01-15026
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed September 6, 2001. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the response provisionally submitted on September 12, 2001. 01-15954
09/21/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-15393
09/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 21, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a response to this court's order of August 13, 2001. This court concludes that it has jurisdiction over this appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a fast track statement and appendix. This appeal shall proceed in accordance with the provisions of NRAP 3C. 01-16310
10/12/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-17275
10/12/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-17277
10/18/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-17606
11/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contention and concluded that it is without merit, we "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-20037
12/26/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20111
12/26/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2002. 01-20111