judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEVEN M. ADAMI, successor Trustee of the Albert Stewart Cellers Trust, dated July 21, 2000 v. NORA BELLE CELLERS

Case Heading (S-08-0111)
Case Number:S-08-0111Case Docketed On:05/27/2008
Linked To: S-08-0110
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:STEVEN M. ADAMI, successor Trustee of the Albert Stewart Cellers Trust, dated July 21, 2000 v. NORA BELLE CELLERS
Full Title:STEVEN M. ADAMI, successor Trustee of the Albert Stewart Cellers Trust, dated July 21, 2000, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. NORA BELLE CELLERS, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSteven M. AdamiBenjamin Scott Kirven
Dennis M. Kirven
AppelleeNora Belle CellersGreg L. Goddard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Marriage and Divorce
Opinion Number:2009 WY 120
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/27/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/02/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record "Initial"Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
06/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Other - amended designation of record on appealNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
07/10/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant. (Electronic brief rejected 07/10/08)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/11/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/22/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/10/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/15/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Benjamin Kirven for Appellee Adami.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/01/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Greg Goddard for appellant Cellers.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/06/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacateEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/07/2008Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/08/2008Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to expedited docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
09/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/20/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal