Case Information: 95-CO-0967 | |||
Short Caption: | JASON LEGGETT V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal |
Lead: | 95-CO-0966 | Consolidated: | 95-CO-0967 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F11694-91 | Filed Date: | 07/17/1995 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/17/1995 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/10/1996 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 03/19/1998 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 06/11/1998 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/22/1998 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Jason E. Leggett | Y |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
07/17/1995 | NOTICE OF APPEAL - trial attorney Betty Clark Bar No. 168633 Phone No. (202)544-0134 | |||
10/03/1995 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
02/23/1996 | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 95-CO-966 and 95-CO-967 are consolidated for all purposes herein. FO that Betty J. Clark, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant. FO that appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statements in these appeals. (BY AMW) | |||
02/23/1996 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Betty J. Clark, Esq. | |||
02/29/1996 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT | |||
02/29/1996 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (95 co 967) | |||
03/14/1996 | ORDER: The consolidated brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. Any request for an extension of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By JAC) | |||
03/21/1996 | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to amend briefing schedule (consent motion) | |||
06/10/1996 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (5 pages--Taped) (6/14/95 proc.) | |||
06/10/1996 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
01/15/1998 | ORDER: The brief of appellant_ shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee_ shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: GP) | |||
02/13/1998 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
03/19/1998 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
03/19/1998 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
03/26/1998 | FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR | |||
06/11/1998 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
06/11/1998 | ARGUED (TE,SC,KG) Betty J. Clark, Esquire, for appellant. William F. Gould, Esquire, for appellee. | |||
06/12/1998 | CERTIFICATE PER RULE 28 | |||
08/28/1998 | AFFIRMED MOJ (TE,SC,KG) | |||
09/22/1998 | MANDATE ISSUED |