judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

OLVERA VS. OLVERA

Case Information: 38233
Short Caption:OLVERA VS. OLVERACourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D005709Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/06/2001 / Tavano, JenniferSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:06/25/2003 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/25/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Marshal S. Willick, P.C.--check no. 6483.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12649
07/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 25, 2001. 01-12716
07/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12718
07/31/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 01-12916
08/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jennifer Elliott-Tavano. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/11/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 20, 2001. 01-17185
12/03/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-20196
12/20/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-21453
01/04/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-00282
02/27/2002MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion for Order to Consolidate Olvera Appeal with This Matter, and to Stay Proceedings pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition concerning the Attempted Redivision of Military Retirement Benefits and from Attempted New Division of Federally Preempted Veterans Disability Benefits more than Six Years after Final Discharge of All Other Existing Spousal Obligations. Nos. 38233 and 39249 02-03656
03/06/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Petitioner's "Motion for Order to Consolidate Olvera Appeal with This Matter, and to Stay Proceedings pending Petition for Writ of Mandamus, or in the Alternative, Petition for Writ of Prohibition concerning the Attempted Redivision of Military Retirement Benefits and from Attempted New Division of Federally Preempted Veterans Disability Benefits more than Six Years after Final Discharge of All Other Existing Spousal Obligations." Nos. 38233 and 39249.. 02-04107
04/17/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-06893
04/26/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 17, 2002. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by June 18, 2002. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 02-07413
05/17/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Clark County Clerk regarding Transmission of the Order entered in district court on April 19, 2002 and also, the Notice of Entry of Order entered on April 23, 2002.
05/20/2002Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order entered in district court on April 19, 2002. 02-08894
05/20/2002Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. filed on April 23, 2002. 02-08895
05/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition in Docket No. 39249, and Denying Motion to Consolidate and Motion for Stay. On April 19, 2002, the district court entered a written order that resolves the issues concerning petitioner's military pension and disability benefits. An order that changes the rights and liabilities of the parties growing out of the final judgment is appealable as a special order after final judgment. We deny the petition in Docket No. 39249. In light of this order, we deny as moot the motion to consolidate and the motion for stay. Nos. 38233/39249-not consolidated. 02-09124
06/20/2002MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 45 pages. 02-10723
06/20/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: June 18, 2002. -- BRIEF STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 8/8/02. 02-10724
06/20/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 02-10728
07/08/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Substitution of Corrected Appellant's Opening Brief. 02-11605
07/08/2002BriefReceived Amended Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. 02-11606
07/24/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 21, 2002. 02-12666
08/08/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed July 8, 2002. The clerk of this court shall strike the opening brief filed on June 20, 2002, and filed the corrected opening brief received on July 8, 2002. 02-13601
08/08/2002BriefFiled Amended Brief. 02-11606
08/26/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. 02-14646
08/28/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The stipulation filed on August 26 2002, is treated as a joint motion for an extension of time. Respondent shall have until October 4, 2002, to file and serve the answering brief. 02-14766
11/07/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. 02-19258
11/14/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-19602
12/09/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-20981
01/08/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Cause appearing, we grant respondent's November 14, 2002, motion. The clerk of this court shall file the copies of the answering brief and the appendix received on October 18, 2002, as well as the original copy of the answering brief and the certificate of compliance received on November 14, 2002. The clerk shall attach the certificate of compliance to the original copy of the answering brief. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's reply brief received on December 30, 2002. We disapprove, as moot, the stipulation filed on November 7, 2002, and deny as moot the motion filed on December 9, 2002, for extensions of time to file the reply brief. 03-00373
01/08/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. 02-18168
01/08/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 10/16/02. (Original Answering Brief). 02-21823
01/08/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-18170
01/08/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. (01/08/03 Order: attached the certificate of compliance to the original and copies of the answering brief). 02-19671
01/08/2003BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 12/27/02. 02-22165
05/02/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 25, 2003, at 11:00 a.m. (En Banc)
06/09/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/12/2003Other Other. Filed Appellant's Supplemental Memorandum. 03-09815
06/25/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. En Banc.
10/29/2003Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." EN BANC 03-18035
11/25/2003RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 03-18142
11/25/2003Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/26/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Publish the Order filed October 29, 2003, as an Opinion. 03-19810
12/04/2003RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 1, 2003. 03-18142
12/17/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Publish. This court previously issued an order resolving this appeal. Appellant Eva Olvera has filed a motion to publish that order as an opinion. Having considered the motion, we conclude that publication is not warranted. We therefore deny the motion to publish. 03-20985