judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSE DELCHEM VIGIL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1262
Short Caption:JOSE DELCHEM VIGIL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-18972-08Filed Date:10/07/2010

Opening Event Date:10/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/15/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJose D. Vigil Y
James W. KleinNY
Leila Thamer NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/20/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (6 pgs/tape) 6/25/10 proc. w/cd
10/21/2010RECORD INDEX
10/21/2010RECORD COPIES
10/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (sealed pleadings)
10/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/02/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CM-910 and 10-CF-1262 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-1262. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion in appeal no. 10-CM-910 for an extension of time within which to file the brief is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 10, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant in appeal no. 10-CF-1262 shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to appeal no. 10-CF-1262 have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for appeal no. 10-CF-1262 have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/17/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (10-CF-1262) RT ordered/needed (pii)
11/18/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo) (JOSE VIRGIL)
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant Jose D. Vigil's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that appellant Jose D. Vigil's motion is granted, and appellant Jose D. Vigil's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011. (JAC)
12/28/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (Ana Isabel Vigil) (unopposed)
01/05/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and limited appendix in appeal no. 10-CM-910 shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011. (By: JAC)
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (3 pgs/tape) 6/8/10 proc.
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. (J. Vigil)dwm no oppo
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (A.I. VIGIL) FOR 90 DAYS (NO OPPO). dwm
04/01/2011ORD GRANT APLTS Motions to extend time to file brief and appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Jose Vigil) 90 days no oppo
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (unopposed) (Ana I. Vigil)
07/25/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellants' motions for extensions of time to file the briefs until September 26, 2011
09/26/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) (J Vigil)Denied as Moot
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (10-CM-910) (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledBrief (10-CM-910) (Appellant)
10/12/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal w/waiver (Appellant) (10-cf-1262)Granted
10/24/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion in appeal no. 10-cf-1262 to dismiss and denying appellant's motion in appeal no. 10-cf-1262 for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix and directing appellee's brief in 30 days from the date of this order and severing appeal no. 10-cf-1262
10/24/2011FiledDismissed
11/15/2011FiledMandate