judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ERNEST and MARTHA ANDERSON v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TETON COUNTY, WYOMING and ROBERT and GISELA BALTENSPERGER

Case Heading (S-08-0102)
Case Number:S-08-0102Case Docketed On:05/19/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:ERNEST and MARTHA ANDERSON v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TETON COUNTY, WYOMING and ROBERT and GISELA BALTENSPERGER
Full Title:ERNEST and MARTHA ANDERSON, Appellants (Petitioners), v. BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TETON COUNTY, WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent), and ROBERT and GISELA BALTENSPERGER, Appellees (Intervenors).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantErnest AndersonAndrea L. Richard
Jennifer Ann Golden
AppellantMartha AndersonAndrea L. Richard
Jennifer Ann Golden
AppelleeRobert BaltenspergerWilliam R. Fix
AppelleeGisela BaltenspergerWilliam R. Fix
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Teton County, WyomingJames L. Radda

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Property
Opinion Number:2009 WY 122
Citation:217 P.3d 401 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/19/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice GoldenNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/29/2008Correspondence - Incoming regarding correction to the caption from James Radda, counsel for appellee Teton County. Caption amended after telephone call by Clerk of Court to Mr. RaddaCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/29/2008Correspondence - Outgoing to counsel and District Court Clerk regarding amended captionCorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
06/30/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantsMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/30/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/01/2008Event - Phone Call at 4:28 p.m. from counsel for appellants. Requested permission to fax file a stay. Advised that all pleadings now are to be e-filed. Case will be dismissed if not filed today and counsel can petition for reinstatementEventPhone CallFinal
08/01/2008Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
08/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received notice of stipulation of stay and motion for stay of appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/06/2008Motion - Stay - other (Supplemental)MotionStay - otherFinal
08/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received supplemental notice of stipulation in support of motion for stay of appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/20/2008Order - Granting stayOrderGranting stayFinal
09/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
10/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received - status report by appellants. Called counsel and requested signed originalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received status report with original signatureEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2008Order - Other - continuing stay of appealOrderOtherFinal
12/03/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellants re missed deadline (12/01/08) to file status report. Event not calendared, will fileEventPhone CallFinal
12/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Status report - otherNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
12/08/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Second Status Report by Appellants (only five copies sent)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2008Order - Lifting Stay of AppealOrderLifting StayFinal
01/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/20/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Opening brief of appellants.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2009Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee/intervenor indicating that the brief of appellant has the wrong caption (district court), and that he was never served with a copy of the brief, although the certificate of service indicates that he was. No action.EventPhone CallFinal
02/24/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Motion for Additonal Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/05/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Board of County Commissioners of Teton County, Wyoming and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel for Teton County and requested original signature on page 37 of brief.EventPhone CallFinal
03/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - replacement pages 37 and 38 with counsel's original signatureNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
03/16/2009Brief - Appellees Robert and Gisela BaltenspergerBriefAppelleeFinal
03/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellees Robert and Gisela BaltenspergerEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/19/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/02/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/08/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/13/2009Order - Assignment of judge - District Judge Wade E. Waldrip assigned to act in this matter for Justice Golden who is recused.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting 0 James Radda for appellee County Commissioners.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jennifer Golden for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/13/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Hill, Kite and Burke, and Judge Waldrip (Jennifer Golden for appellants; James L. Radda and William R. Fix for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/13/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/17/2009Correspondence - Incoming - received letter from Ms. Baltensperger regarding mediation.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
08/18/2009Correspondence - Outgoing - letter in response to Ms. Baltensperger's letter.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
08/31/2009Correspondence - Incoming from Gisela Baltensperger, no response necessaryCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/22/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/22/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/28/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/26/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal