judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JUSTIN DEAN EICKBUSH v. LISA ANN EICKBUSH

Case Heading (S-07-0030)
Case Number:S-07-0030Case Docketed On:02/07/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:JUSTIN DEAN EICKBUSH v. LISA ANN EICKBUSH
Full Title:JUSTIN DEAN EICKBUSH, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. LISA ANN EICKBUSH, Appellee (Defendant)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJustin Dean EickbushDaNece Day
AppelleeLisa Ann EickbushKathryn J. Edelman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2007 WY 179
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/07/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/07/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA attachments received.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
02/07/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/07/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/07/2007Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
02/21/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
03/22/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
03/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
05/09/2007Brief - Failure to file - appellee (Brief was due 5/8/07)BriefFailure to file - appelleeFinal
05/11/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/21/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/29/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/09/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/15/2007Motion - Fees and costs - Motion for costs pursuant to W.R.A.P. 10.04 - contacted counsel and let her know that the costs will be awarded in the mandate and no further action will be taken on the motion.MotionFees and costsFinal
11/19/2007Notice-Internal - Other - Sr. staff attorney requested motion for fees be put on conference agenda - order will be entered.Notice-InternalOtherFinal
12/04/2007Order - Awarding costs on reversal.OrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/04/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/04/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/04/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/06/07 by Michelle Lieber.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal