judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE v. LEE ROY CRAWFORD PRODUCE COMPANY

Case: A-2678
A-2678
05/01/1950
Application for Writ of Error
GUY A. THOMPSON, TRUSTEE
LEE ROY CRAWFORD PRODUCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/19/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/29/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/19/1950Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/10/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/01/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/19/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/04/1950Opinion issued
06/29/1950Brief on the Merits
06/19/1950Supplemental Brief filed
05/24/1950Document received (See Remarks)
05/10/1950Response to Petition
05/01/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guy A. Thompson, TrusteePetitioner
Lee Roy Crawford Produce CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information