judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF GARLAND

Case Information: 38232
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF GARLANDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38575 , 41836
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G22410Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/10/2001 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Mark A. Jenkin Ltd.--check no. 5370.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12648
07/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/30/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 24, 2001. 01-12794
08/10/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/14/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13791
08/16/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Aubrey Goldberg.
02/04/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-02303
02/11/2002Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brie to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). 02-02677
02/26/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 18, 2001 and June 15, 2001. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. 02-03550
03/06/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why these appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant may be able to cure the jurisdictional defect in Docket No. 38575 as to the September order by obtaining a file-stamped order and filing an amended notice of appeal in compliance with NRAP 4(a)(1). fn8[We note that the June 26, 2001 order also does not include a file stamp. Since it appears that the June order is not substantively appealable, providing this court with a file-stamped copy of that order and filing an amended notice of appeal will not cure the jurisdictional defect.] Failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in the dismissal of these appeals. Nos. 38232/38575-these cases are not consolidated. (02-04099) 02-04099
03/28/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 18, 2001 and June 15, 2001. Court Reporter: Debbie Lohmuller. Nos. 38232 & 38575. Filed in no. 38232. 02-05524
06/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal in Docket No. 38232 and Allowing Appeal in Docket No. 38575 to Proceed. Accordingly, as we lack jurisdiction in Docket No. 38232, " . . . we order the appeal dismissed." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. Nos. 38232/38575-cases are not consolidated. 02-10051
07/05/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-10597
07/05/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/16/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 9, 2002. 02-10597