judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARNATA A. FISHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1261
Short Caption:ARNATA A. FISHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-23542-09Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArnata A. Fisher Y
George E. RickmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that George Rickman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) George Rickman, Esquire
12/09/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 26, 2010, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
12/14/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT NO OPPO
12/14/2010RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (183 pgs/Gilliam) 7/8/10 proc.
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (184-290 pgs/Gilliam) 7/9/10 proc.
12/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (9 pgs/Ott) 7/12/10 proc. w/cd
12/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/28/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
12/29/2010RECORD COPIES
12/29/2010RECORD INDEX
02/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until March 21, 2011 (unopposed)
02/09/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. (JAC)
03/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF no oppo
03/25/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
03/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
03/31/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/31/2011APPENDIX
04/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/04/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
07/19/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
07/19/2011FiledAffirmed
07/20/2011LodgedMotion to file Opposition/Reply Brief out of time (Appellant)
07/20/2011LodgedMotion For Summary Reversal (Appellant)
08/25/2011FiledOrder Denying Appellant's motions as moot.
08/25/2011FiledMandate