judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6101
A-6101
11/27/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MITCHELLS, INC.
BEN FRIEDMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/19/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/06/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/06/1957Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
04/17/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/26/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
02/24/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/18/1957Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/06/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/05/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/27/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/24/1957Response to Motion filed
06/19/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/05/1957Opinion issued
05/06/1957Response to Brief filed
05/06/1957Supplemental Brief filed
04/17/1957Supplemental Brief filed
03/20/1957Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1957Response to Brief filed
02/24/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/18/1957Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/11/1957Response to Motion filed
02/06/1957Motion for Rehearing
12/05/1956Response to Petition
11/27/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/27/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas Real Estate Board, IncorporatedAmicus Curiae
Texas Real Estate Association, Inc.Amicus Curiae
Ben FriedmanRespondent
Mitchells, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information