judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEDIST GIRMA V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER

Case Information: 10-CV-1285
Short Caption:KEDIST GIRMA V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM5345-10Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/25/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKedist GirmaYPro SeN
AppelleeWashington Hospital CenterN
Daniel C. CostelloNY
Jennifer E. PhillipsNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL ****STRUCK******** SEE 12/17/10 ORDER BELOW
11/01/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
11/02/2010TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss
11/22/2010 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. See D.C App. R. 4 (a)(6). It is FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SIGN THE NOA in accordance with DC App. R. 3 (c)(2). Failure to comply shall result in the notice being stricken and dismissal of the appeal. (OBNBFA) (jl)
12/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 22, 2010, which directed appellant to sign the notice of appeal within 20 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that the notice of appeal is hereby stricken. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 3 (c)(2). (ETW) elp
12/17/2010DISMISSED
01/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion to reinstate appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that this appeal was dismissed for appellant's failure to sign the notice of appeal as directed, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order come in and sign the notice of appeal. Failure to comply with this order shall result in the denial of appellant's motion to reinstate. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate is hereby held in abeyance pending further order of this court. (ETW) elp
02/02/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of Court's 1/28/11 order re reinstatement.
02/07/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- to court order 1/28/11 (signing the notice of appeal)
02/22/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for reconsideration of this court's order of January 28, 2011, which held in abeyance appellant's motion to reinstate appeal and directed appellant to sign the notice of appeal, and it appearing that appellant has complied with the order, and it further appearing that appellant was granted cost-waived status in the Superior Court and that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to reinstate is granted and thia appeal is hereby reinstated. It is (MORE)
02/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion for reconsideration is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index/record copies. (ETW) elp
02/25/2011RECORD INDEX
02/25/2011RECORD COPIES
02/25/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/02/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
04/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 2, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief and the limited appendix, as required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failureeither to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
04/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file brief and the limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 8, 2011. (JAC) elp
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF July
05/24/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to motion for ext of time ALSO, notice that aplt is not serving aple.
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and the limited appendix, the opposition thereto, and it appearing that appellant has failed to serve appellee with any pleadings filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 8, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant must follow the rules of this court regardless of her pro se status. See Macleod v. Georgetown Univ., 736 A. 2d 977, 979-980 (D.C. 1999). (ETW) elp
06/01/2011NOTICE RECEIVED - from aple, advising the Court that aplt has failed to serve counsel with any pleadings.
06/28/2011FiledAPLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
07/22/2011FiledOrder Denying APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and Directing Appellant to serve all pleadings on Appellee and Directing Appellant to file the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave.
08/19/2011FiledMotion for leave to supplement w/ attachment (Appellant)Denied
10/03/2011FiledReceived - Order dated 7/22/11, mailed to appellant at the most recent address on record and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and "box closed" and forwarded to files this date (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledMotion to contiune appeal (Appellant)Denied
11/10/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee)Denied as Moot
11/16/2011FiledOrder Denying APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD
11/16/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion to contiune appeal (Appellant)
11/16/2011FiledOrder Denying Motion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee) (AS MOOT)
11/16/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
11/16/2011FiledDismissed
12/09/2011FiledMandate
02/23/2012FiledReceived Order dated 11/16/11, mailed to appellant at the following address - P.O. Box 73846, Washington, DC 20056, and returned by USPS as "unable" to forward and remailed to appellant at the latest address on record this date. elp (Appellant)