judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOSHUA KELLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0123)
Case Number:S-08-0123Case Docketed On:06/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:JOSHUA KELLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOSHUA KELLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJoshua KelleyDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 3
Citation:199 P.3d 521

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court; called District Court Clerk re transcripts, they have been filedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/16/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/29/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/29/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/15/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/19/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
09/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts & Pre-Sentence Investigation Report.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/14/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief justice Voigt writing for the Court. Justice Hill files a specially concurring opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/30/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/04/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for, no date of delivery was filled in.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal