judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EMDE (GERALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33425
Short Caption:EMDE (GERALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR920896Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/10/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/04/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/04/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 98-00252
02/10/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-00913
08/16/1999Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Granted. Order Granting Rehearing, Reinstating appeal, and directing Transmission of the Record. We conclude that appellant's notice of appeal was timely filed. " . . . we grant appellant's petition for reheairng, and we reinstate this appeal." Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-07642
09/10/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-08568
09/10/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-16428
10/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16561
10/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/01/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 25, 2001. 01-16561