judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6102
A-6102
11/27/1956
Application for Writ of Error
D. H. BOLIN
DR. P. K. SMITH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/07/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/06/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/27/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/04/1957Motion for leave to file briefOverruled
02/08/1957Response to Motion filed
02/07/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1956Response to Petition
11/27/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/27/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
D. H. BolinPetitioner
Dr. P. K. Smith, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information