judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6081
A-6081
11/13/1956
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF AUSTIN
LEROY POWELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/13/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/13/1957Response to Motion filed
06/07/1957Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
02/27/1957Opinion issued
01/09/1957Document received (See Remarks)
11/13/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/13/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Leroy PowellRespondent
City of AustinPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information