judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NATHAN A. FORRESTER V. NANCY N. PETROVIC

Case Information: 10-FM-1286
Short Caption:NATHAN A. FORRESTER V. NANCY N. PETROVICClassification:Appeals - Family - Custody
Lead:10-FM-1286Consolidated: 10-FM-1369
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB3458-02Filed Date:10/12/2010

Opening Event Date:10/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNathan A. Forrester N
Alan B. SoschinNY
AppelleeNancy N. Petrovic N
Judith L. WalterNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/12/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been PREMATURELY FILED as the case remains pending in the trial court. See DC Code 11-721 (2001);... (BY: ETW)
11/03/2010TMC - OTSC (2) - ROTSC (FORRESTER)
11/17/2010 ORDERED that APPEAL NOS. 10FM1286 and 10FM1369 are hereby CONSOLIATED for all purposes. It is *****MORE*****
11/17/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE/APPELLANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this APPEAL NO 10FM1369 should not be dismissed as having been PREMATURELY FILED... (BY:ETW)
11/23/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - to 11/3/10 order (10FM1286)
12/07/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (BY: PETROVIC) LW
12/09/2010 ORDERED that these APPEALS ARE HEREBY DISMISSED as PREMATURELY FILED but W/O PREJUDICE to the parties filing new appeals once Petrovic's motion has been resolved. See DC App. R. 4(a)(4). (RZNBTE) (rm)
12/09/2010DISMISSED
12/30/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived