judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBIE VS. LORNTZEN

Case Information: 33426
Short Caption:ROBIE VS. LORNTZENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 97CV0113Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/22/1998 / Gruesen, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/04/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Michael B. Springer--check no. 8913.
12/04/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00263
12/15/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00389
12/22/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge:Thomas W. Gruesen, Sr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/28/1998Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 98-00531
01/07/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. November 13, 1998 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Joan Wilder. 99-00088
03/08/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-01619
03/08/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-01620
03/16/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 99-01872
03/16/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.