judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6051
A-6051
10/19/1956
Application for Writ of Error
RALPH BRITTEN AND ED WELLER
CLARENCE C. WILLIAMS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1956Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/30/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/29/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
10/19/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1956Response to Motion filed
12/04/1956Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/30/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/29/1956Response to Petition
10/19/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/19/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ralph Britten and Ed WellerPetitioner
Clarence C. Williams, et al.Respondent
Clark, Coon, Holt, and ReedAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information