judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6078
A-6078
11/09/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MOTOR AND INDUSTRIAL FINANCE CORPORATION
EMERY H. HUGHES, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/27/1957Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
05/23/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/19/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/16/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/16/1956Response to PetitionPetitioner
11/09/1956Amended PetitionRespondent
11/09/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
11/09/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/27/1957Brief in Support of Petition
05/23/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/08/1957Opinion issued
12/19/1956Document received (See Remarks)
12/19/1956Document received (See Remarks)
12/19/1956Document received (See Remarks)
11/19/1956Reply to Response
11/16/1956Response to Petition
11/16/1956Response to Petition
11/09/1956Amended Petition
11/09/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/09/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/09/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Emery H. Hughes, et ux.Respondent
Motor and Industrial Finance CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information