judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6106
A-6106
11/30/1956
Application for Writ of Error
HUNTER FLORES, DBA FREEPORT MACHINE AND BOILER SHOP
TOWER CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC., OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/21/1957Errata FiledRespondent
03/13/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/09/1957Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/10/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
11/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/12/1958Order from Lower Court filed
06/11/1957Miscellaneous letter
05/30/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/21/1957Errata Filed
05/15/1957Order from Lower Court filed
05/15/1957Opinion issued
03/13/1957Response to Brief filed
03/09/1957Brief on the Merits
03/08/1957Letter Filed
02/06/1957Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1957Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1957Document received (See Remarks)
12/10/1956Response to Petition
11/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/30/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tower Contracting Company, Inc., of TexasRespondent
Hunter Flores, dba Freeport Machine and Boiler ShopPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information