judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: RULE 2 OF THE LOCAL RULES OF PRACTICE FOR THE SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT

Administrative Case: ADKT 0328
Short Caption:IN RE: RULE 2 OF THE LOCAL RULES OF PRACTICE FOR THE SECOND JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:11/28/2001Public Hearing:
Closed Date:02/06/2002

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/28/2001Administrative CaseFiled Petition. (Proposed Order Amending Rule 2 attached.) 01-21978
12/14/2001Administrative CaseFiled Request from Amy Harvey, Washoe County Clerk. 01-21979
01/03/2002Administrative CaseFiled Response of the Second Judicial District Court of the State of Nevada to the Untitled Document Submitted December 14, 2001 by County Clerk Amy Harvey. 02-22316
01/08/2002Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket.
02/06/2002Administrative CaseFiled Order Amending Rule 2 of the Rules of Practice for the Second Judicial District Court (Exhibit A attached). Effective immediately. 02-22317
02/06/2002Administrative CaseIssued Notice to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.
02/06/2002Administrative CaseCase Closed.