judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6070
A-6070
11/08/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ALLAN V. RILEY
INDUSTRIAL FINANCE SERVICE COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/20/1957Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/18/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/31/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/27/1956Response to Brief filedPetitioner
11/16/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
11/12/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/18/1958Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
11/20/1957Brief on the Merits
11/12/1957Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
06/18/1957Reply to Response
06/11/1957Response to Motion filed
05/31/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/24/1957Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
05/15/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
05/15/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
05/15/1957Opinion issued
12/27/1956Response to Brief filed
11/28/1956Document received (See Remarks)
11/16/1956Reply to Response
11/12/1956Response to Petition
11/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/08/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allan V. RileyPetitioner
Industrial Finance Service Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information