judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6069
A-6069
11/08/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MERCANTILE NATIONAL BANK AT DALLAS, WILLIAM KENNEDY WEBSTER, LURA WEBSTER BLACK, ET VIR, BILLY BLACK, WILLIAM KENNEDY WEBSTER, ET AL.
MARY ETTA K. WEBSTER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/13/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/11/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/19/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
11/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/15/1956Response to Motion filed
12/13/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/11/1956Motion for Rehearing
11/19/1956Response to Petition
11/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/08/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William Kennedy Webster, Lura Webster Black, et vir, Billy BlackPetitioner
William Kennedy Webster, et al.Petitioner
Mary Etta K. WebsterRespondent
Mercantile National Bank at DallasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information