judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6088
A-6088
11/19/1956
Application for Writ of Error
ADDIE DAMON, RUTH CAROLYN WILSON AND ROBERT C. WILSON, JR., W. STEWART BOYLE, ET AL.
S. MINCHEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/22/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
11/27/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/19/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/27/1956Response to Motion filed
12/22/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/30/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/27/1956Response to Petition
11/19/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/19/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. Stewart Boyle, et al.Petitioner
Addie Damon, Ruth Carolyn Wilson and Robert C. Wilson, Jr.Petitioner
S. MinchenRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information