judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6095
A-6095
11/22/1956
Application for Writ of Error
SCYENE INVESTMENT COMPANY
CITY OF MESQUITE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/24/1957Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/07/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/01/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/04/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/22/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/24/1957Supplemental Brief filed
02/07/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/01/1957Reply to Response
12/04/1956Response to Petition
11/22/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
11/22/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Scyene Investment CompanyPetitioner
City of MesquiteRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information