judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-6075
A-6075
11/09/1956
Application for Writ of Error
T.I.M.E., INCORPORATED
MARYLAND CASUALTY CO., A CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/28/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/14/1957Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/11/1957Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
11/15/1956Errata FiledRespondent
11/15/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
11/09/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/28/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/13/1957Opinion issued
01/14/1957Brief on the Merits
01/11/1957Brief on the Merits
12/05/1956Document received (See Remarks)
11/15/1956Errata Filed
11/15/1956Response to Petition
11/09/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/09/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Maryland Casualty Co., a CorporationRespondent
T.I.M.E., IncorporatedPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information