judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBBINS VS. KLEVE

Case Information: 38219
Short Caption:ROBBINS VS. KLEVECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352719Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Becker, MaupinCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/06/2001 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Hutchison & Steffen Ltd.--check no. 12688.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12466
08/03/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/06/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/08/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13391
08/10/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Craig A. Hoppe.
10/29/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 15, 2002. 01-18111
02/25/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-03516
03/11/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 02-04307
03/11/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.