judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATRICK FEENEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0087)
Case Number:S-08-0087Case Docketed On:04/18/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:PATRICK FEENEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PATRICK FEENEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPatrick FeeneyDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 67
Citation:208 P.3d 50

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/18/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/30/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/04/2008Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee. Received in today's mail the brief of appellant bearing the postmark date 06/03/08EventPhone CallFinal
07/10/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/11/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/29/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/06/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, four volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibit; Volume IV, Confidetial Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Dion Custis for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Order - Other - emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument, Justice Kite unavailableOrderOtherFinal
10/20/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Dion Custis for appellant; Leda Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee).EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/21/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/08/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/08/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/10/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 6/9/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal