judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALVIN SHARPLES V. JAPHET NWOSU

Case Information: 10-CV-1250
Short Caption:ALVIN SHARPLES V. JAPHET NWOSUClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB4328-08Filed Date:10/06/2010

Opening Event Date:10/06/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlvin Sharples NPro SeN
AppelleeJaphet Nwosu N
Michael A. DesantisNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/21/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 6, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
10/25/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 7/16/10) (elp)
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (10-pgs/tape 7/1610 proc.)w/cd
11/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/04/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/04/2010RECORD INDEX
12/16/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 4, 2010, directing appellant to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
01/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of December 16, 2010, directing appellant to submit the brief and the appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
01/18/2011DISMISSED
02/09/2011MANDATE ISSUED