judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

A.I. CREDIT CORP. VS. RICHTER ROBB PACIFIC INS.

Case Information: 38214
Short Caption:A.I. CREDIT CORP. VS. RICHTER ROBB PACIFIC INS.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CI14013Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/30/2001 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Blalock & Associates--check no. 45665.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12439
08/30/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to file a complete and accurate docketing statement in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-14941
09/11/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Remand or Dismiss Appeal Without Prejudice. 01-15289
09/11/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-15296
12/03/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-20175
12/03/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-20177
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Appellant's September 11, 2001 Motion to Remand or Dismiss Appeal Without Prejudice is denied as moot.] NNP/CLK 01-20979
12/13/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.