judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUCE SANDBERG and DIANE WIDES, as Co-Trustees of the Wides-Sandberg Trust; EDGAR J. PERRITON and DWYLA D. PERRITON, Trustees of the Edgar John Perriton and Dwyla Dee Perriton Revocable Trust; DAN H. DILLINGER and BONITA W. DILLINGER, Husband and Wife; GLENN D. STILES, Trustee of the Glenn D. Stiles Revocable Trust and WINONA M. STILES, Trustee of the Winona M. Stiles Revocable Trust; ESTHER R. EVANS, Trustee of the Esther R. Evans Revocable Trust; LINDA SUE WOOLSEY; MARJORIE S. FINCHER, Trustee of the Marjorie S. Fincher Revocable Trust; GARY R. PRESSE and ANDREA L. PRESSE, Husband and Wife; JOSEPH P. ROBBERSON and KATHLEEN M. ROBBERSON, Husband and Wife; TIMOTHY S. SUMMERS and ELAINA SUMMERS, Husband and Wife; DAVID KILPATRICK and NIKKI MALCOM; DOUGLAS R. TAYLOR and TERESA L. TAYLOR, Husband and Wife; LEE H. GARLACH, Trustee of the Lee H. Garlach Revocable Trust and ANN GARLACH, Trustee of the Ann Garlach Revocable Trust: DARRYL OBSORNE and LAUREEN OSBORN, Husband and Wife; DENNIS C. FANNING and LORI J. FANNING, Husband and Wife; ROBERT M. GREGORY and DANA L. GREGORY, Husband and Wife; B.D. PARKS and E. MARIE PARKS, Trustees of the Parks Family Revocable Trust; PHILLIP J. BALLAND and JULIE A. BALLAND, Husband and Wife; ANTHONY D. "SKIP" REED and PATRICIA A. REED, Husband and Wife; KEITH L. DOBSON and KAREN L. DOBSON, Husband and Wife; CLYDE A. PARKER and FRANCES E. PARKER, Husband and Wife; JOHN M. MASON and SHARLENE G. MASON, Husband and Wife; JESS A. SANDOVAL and JULIE L. SANDOVAL, Husband and Wife; JEFFREY L. HOUR and REBECCA A. HOUR, Husband and Wife; LAWRENCE RODNEY LARSON, Trustee of the Larson Family Living Trust; RANDY BAYNE and SUSAN BAYNE, Husband and Wife; JAMES R. COLE and JANINE A. COLE, Husband and Wife; E. WAYNE BOTNER and CLAUDIA BOTNER, Husband and Wife; WARREN P. FRY, JR., and VICKIE L. FRY, Husband and Wife; RITA INOWAY; ROBERT A. SIGSBURY and LAURA J. SIGSBURY, Husband and Wife; ROBERT O. BUCKLES and MARGARET K. BUCKLES, Husband and Wife; VAN C. SCHERRER and CHERYL B. SCHERRER, Trustees of the Scherrer Revocable Trust; DON R. CHRISTIANSON and MEI CHRISTIANSON, Husband and Wife, v. CHRIS R. OLSEN

Case Heading (S-08-0082)
Case Number:S-08-0082Case Docketed On:04/10/2008
Linked To: S-08-0081
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:BRUCE SANDBERG and DIANE WIDES, as Co-Trustees of the Wides-Sandberg Trust; EDGAR J. PERRITON and DWYLA D. PERRITON, Trustees of the Edgar John Perriton and Dwyla Dee Perriton Revocable Trust; DAN H. DILLINGER and BONITA W. DILLINGER, Husband and Wife; GLENN D. STILES, Trustee of the Glenn D. Stiles Revocable Trust and WINONA M. STILES, Trustee of the Winona M. Stiles Revocable Trust; ESTHER R. EVANS, Trustee of the Esther R. Evans Revocable Trust; LINDA SUE WOOLSEY; MARJORIE S. FINCHER, Trustee of the Marjorie S. Fincher Revocable Trust; GARY R. PRESSE and ANDREA L. PRESSE, Husband and Wife; JOSEPH P. ROBBERSON and KATHLEEN M. ROBBERSON, Husband and Wife; TIMOTHY S. SUMMERS and ELAINA SUMMERS, Husband and Wife; DAVID KILPATRICK and NIKKI MALCOM; DOUGLAS R. TAYLOR and TERESA L. TAYLOR, Husband and Wife; LEE H. GARLACH, Trustee of the Lee H. Garlach Revocable Trust and ANN GARLACH, Trustee of the Ann Garlach Revocable Trust: DARRYL OBSORNE and LAUREEN OSBORN, Husband and Wife; DENNIS C. FANNING and LORI J. FANNING, Husband and Wife; ROBERT M. GREGORY and DANA L. GREGORY, Husband and Wife; B.D. PARKS and E. MARIE PARKS, Trustees of the Parks Family Revocable Trust; PHILLIP J. BALLAND and JULIE A. BALLAND, Husband and Wife; ANTHONY D. "SKIP" REED and PATRICIA A. REED, Husband and Wife; KEITH L. DOBSON and KAREN L. DOBSON, Husband and Wife; CLYDE A. PARKER and FRANCES E. PARKER, Husband and Wife; JOHN M. MASON and SHARLENE G. MASON, Husband and Wife; JESS A. SANDOVAL and JULIE L. SANDOVAL, Husband and Wife; JEFFREY L. HOUR and REBECCA A. HOUR, Husband and Wife; LAWRENCE RODNEY LARSON, Trustee of the Larson Family Living Trust; RANDY BAYNE and SUSAN BAYNE, Husband and Wife; JAMES R. COLE and JANINE A. COLE, Husband and Wife; E. WAYNE BOTNER and CLAUDIA BOTNER, Husband and Wife; WARREN P. FRY, JR., and VICKIE L. FRY, Husband and Wife; RITA INOWAY; ROBERT A. SIGSBURY and LAURA J. SIGSBURY, Husband and Wife; ROBERT O. BUCKLES and MARGARET K. BUCKLES, Husband and Wife; VAN C. SCHERRER and CHERYL B. SCHERRER, Trustees of the Scherrer Revocable Trust; DON R. CHRISTIANSON and MEI CHRISTIANSON, Husband and Wife, v. CHRIS R. OLSEN
Full Title:BRUCE SANDBERG and DIANE WIDES, as Co-Trustees of the Wides-Sandberg Trust; EDGAR J. PERRITON and DWYLA D. PERRITON, Trustees of the Edgar John Perriton and Dwyla Dee Perriton Revocable Trust; DAN H. DILLINGER and BONITA W. DILLINGER, Husband and Wife; GLENN D. STILES, Trustee of the Glenn D. Stiles Revocable Trust and WINONA M. STILES, Trustee of the Winona M. Stiles Revocable Trust; ESTHER R. EVANS, Trustee of the Esther R. Evans Revocable Trust; LINDA SUE WOOLSEY; MARJORIE S. FINCHER, Trustee of the Marjorie S. Fincher Revocable Trust; GARY R. PRESSE and ANDREA L. PRESSE, Husband and Wife; JOSEPH P. ROBBERSON and KATHLEEN M. ROBBERSON, Husband and Wife; TIMOTHY S. SUMMERS and ELAINA SUMMERS, Husband and Wife; DAVID KILPATRICK and NIKKI MALCOM; DOUGLAS R. TAYLOR and TERESA L. TAYLOR, Husband and Wife; LEE H. GARLACH, Trustee of the Lee H. Garlach Revocable Trust and ANN GARLACH, Trustee of the Ann Garlach Revocable Trust: DARRYL OBSORNE and LAUREEN OSBORN, Husband and Wife; DENNIS C. FANNING and LORI J. FANNING, Husband and Wife; ROBERT M. GREGORY and DANA L. GREGORY, Husband and Wife; B.D. PARKS and E. MARIE PARKS, Trustees of the Parks Family Revocable Trust; PHILLIP J. BALLAND and JULIE A. BALLAND, Husband and Wife; ANTHONY D. "SKIP" REED and PATRICIA A. REED, Husband and Wife; KEITH L. DOBSON and KAREN L. DOBSON, Husband and Wife; CLYDE A. PARKER and FRANCES E. PARKER, Husband and Wife; JOHN M. MASON and SHARLENE G. MASON, Husband and Wife; JESS A. SANDOVAL and JULIE L. SANDOVAL, Husband and Wife; JEFFREY L. HOUR and REBECCA A. HOUR, Husband and Wife; LAWRENCE RODNEY LARSON, Trustee of the Larson Family Living Trust; RANDY BAYNE and SUSAN BAYNE, Husband and Wife; JAMES R. COLE and JANINE A. COLE, Husband and Wife; E. WAYNE BOTNER and CLAUDIA BOTNER, Husband and Wife; WARREN P. FRY, JR., and VICKIE L. FRY, Husband and Wife; RITA INOWAY; ROBERT A. SIGSBURY and LAURA J. SIGSBURY, Husband and Wife; ROBERT O. BUCKLES and MARGARET K. BUCKLES, Husband and Wife; VAN C. SCHERRER and CHERYL B. SCHERRER, Trustees of the Scherrer Revocable Trust; DON R. CHRISTIANSON and MEI CHRISTIANSON, Husband and Wife, Appellants (Defendants), v. CHRIS R. OLSEN, Appellee (Plaintiff)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBruce SandbergGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDiane WidesGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantEdgar J. PerritonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDwyla D. PerritonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDan H. DillingerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantBonita W. DillingerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantGlenn D. StilesGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantWinona M. StilesGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantEsther R. EvansGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantLinda Sue WoolseyGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantMarjorie S. FincherGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantGary R. PresseGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantAndrea L. PresseGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJoseph R. RobbersonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantKathleen M. RobbersonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantTimothy S. SummersGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantElaina SummersGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDavid M. KilpatrickGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantNikki V. MalcomGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDouglas R. TaylorGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantTeresa L. TaylorGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantLee H. GarlachGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantAnn GarlachGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDarryl OsborneGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantLaureen OsborneGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDennis C. FanningGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantLori J. FanningGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantRobert M. GregoryGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDana L. GregoryGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantB. D. ParksGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantE. Marie ParksGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantPhillip J. BallandGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJulie A. BallandGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantAnthony D. Skip ReedGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantPatricia A. ReedGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantKeith L. DobsonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantKaren L. DobsonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantClyde A. ParkerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantFrances E. ParkerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJohn M. MasonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantSharlene G. MasonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJess A. SandovalGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJulie L. SandovalGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJeffrey L. HourGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantRebecca A. HourGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantLawrence Rodney LarsonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantRandy BayneGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantSusan BayneGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJames R. ColeGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantJanine A. ColeGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantE. Wayne BotnerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantClaudia BotnerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantWarren P. Fry Jr.Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantVickie L. FryGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantRita InowayGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantRobert A. SigsburyGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantLaura J. SigsburyGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantRobert O. BucklesGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantMargaret K. BucklesGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantVan C. ScherrerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantCheryl B. ScherrerGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantDon R. ChristiansonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppellantMei ChristiansonGay Vanderpoel Woodhouse
Deborah Lynn Roden
Monique Joy Ojeda
AppelleeChris R. OlsenDaniel E. White

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/16/2008Correspondence - Incoming from Michele R. Hankins re nonparticipationCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/27/2008Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/23/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntary and motion to suspend running of time for appellee's brief pending resolution of this motionMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
06/24/2008Order - Stay briefing pending resolution of motion to dismiss appeal (order file stamped with wrong date--original order corrected)OrderStay briefingFinal
07/07/2008Response/Objection - Motion - Appellants' response and memorandum of law in opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
07/07/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' response and memorandum of law in opposition to appellee's motion to dismiss appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
07/31/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal