judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHALINA MURRELL V. D.C. WATER & SEWER AUTHORITY

Case Information: 10-CV-1210
Short Caption:SHALINA MURRELL V. D.C. WATER & SEWER AUTHORITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3286-10Filed Date:09/29/2010

Opening Event Date:09/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:05/10/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/06/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/21/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShalina MurrellNPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Water & Sewer AuthorityN
Meena GowdaNY
Emil HirschYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (Initially filed as a PFR (Administrative Agency case converted on 10/12/10 to Civil Action case)dwm
09/29/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/30/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
10/19/2010 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk SHALL TRANSMIT THE ATTACHED PETITION FOR REVIEW to the CIVIL ACTIONS BRANCH to be filed as a NOA, NPT, to September 29, 2010. It is *****MORE*****
10/19/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (BY: ETW) lw
11/17/2010 On consideration of this court's order of October 19, 2010, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
11/17/2010DISMISSED
11/18/2010RECEIVED - aplt's statement regarding transcript
11/18/2010RECEIVED - ltr from aplt requesting to review and amend order filed on 10/19/10
12/09/2010MANDATE ISSUED
12/22/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION & REINSTATE
01/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for reconsideration and to reinstate appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, the lodged statement regarding transcript, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, and the lodged record index, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that the mandate issued by this court on December 9, 2010, is hereby recalled. It is (MORE)
01/21/2011MANDATE RECALLED
01/21/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the motion is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerks shall file the lodged statement regarding transcript. It is (MORE)
01/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL) (elp)
01/21/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerks shall file the lodged record index. It is (MORE)
01/21/2011RECORD INDEX (**PENDING WITH TTA)
01/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/21/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW) elp
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/ appendix
03/01/2011APPENDIX
04/06/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on March 1, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before April 5, 2011, (See D.C. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall within 20 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
04/26/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF
04/26/2011RECEIVED- aple's brief w/ supplemental appendix
05/10/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and the supplemental appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief of appellee and the supplemental appendix are filed. It is (MORE)
05/10/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/10/2011APPENDIX - Supplemental
05/10/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC) elp
05/10/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/17/2011FiledLetter From Counsel Requesting Oral Argument (Appellant) (pro-se)
11/28/2011FiledOrder Denying pro se aplt's request for oral argument & a new scheduled date.
12/06/2011FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Oberly,Pyror
12/29/2011FiledDismissed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and pryor, Senior Judge.)
01/20/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Petition for Rehearing (Appellant)
01/20/2012LodgedPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)
01/25/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's pro se motion for leave to file the lodged petition for rehearing and the Clerk is directed to file the lodged petition.
01/25/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)Granted
01/30/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing.
02/21/2012FiledMandate
04/17/2014FiledArchived