judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RASHAWN M. KING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1263
Short Caption:RASHAWN M. KING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-25164-08Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/28/2013
Argued/Submitted:05/30/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/26/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
James M. Perez YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/29/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Debra L. Soltis, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
10/29/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Debra L. Soltis, Esquire
11/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (8 pgs/tape) 10/25/08 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (48 pgs/Kaczorowski) 10/31/08 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/Gilliam) 4/2/10 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (56 pgs/Richer) 6/21/10 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (57-190 pgs/Richer) 6/22/10 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (219 pgs/Hunt) 6/23/10 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (160 pgs/Richer) 6/24/10 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (161-171 pgs/Richer) 6/25/10 proc.
04/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (172-335 pgs/Richer) 6/28/10 proc.
04/04/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (336-474 pgs/Richer) 6/29/10 proc.
04/04/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (474-483 pgs/Richer) 7/1/10 proc.
04/04/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (16 pgs/Maddox) 9/10/10 proc. (no cd)
04/14/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/04/2011RECORD INDEX
05/04/2011RECORD COPIES
05/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 120 days. no oppo
05/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 21, 2011. (JAC)
09/07/2011FiledMotion To Stay Briefing Schedule pending completion of Transcipts (no oppo). (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #13 (SEALED orders)
11/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET (for RT reasons)
01/04/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #14 (184 pgs/Richer) 6/21/10 proc. w/cd
01/04/2012FiledRECORD COMPLETED
01/26/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
03/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
06/22/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 10/3/12.
09/20/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
10/05/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 111/2/12
10/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
11/01/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/9/12
11/09/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/09/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/24/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 1/28/13
01/28/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/28/2013FiledBriefing Completed
02/22/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
02/25/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
02/25/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/08/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
04/01/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/30/2013FiledArgued Before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Ruiz
08/22/2013FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Ruiz, Senior Judge.)
09/06/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/26/2013FiledMandate