judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JULIE McCLAIN MORRIS v. CMS OIL AND GAS COMPANY

Case Heading (S-08-0103)
Case Number:S-08-0103Case Docketed On:05/19/2008
Linked To: S-08-0104
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:JULIE McCLAIN MORRIS v. CMS OIL AND GAS COMPANY
Full Title:JULIE McCLAIN MORRIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CMS OIL AND GAS COMPANY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJulie McClain MorrisPatrick G. Davidson
Rebecca Lynn Winkler
AppelleeCMS Oil and Gas CompanyThomas Reese
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
Drake D. Hill

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Royalties
Opinion Number:2010 WY 37
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/19/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/19/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/19/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/02/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
07/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received. Received designation of record for filing; returned to counsel for filing in trial courtEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/08/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/20/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from the District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/08/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/08/2008Motion - Other - motion to submit case on expedited docket.MotionOtherFinal
09/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received reply brief of appellant and motion for submission of case without oral argument and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/11/2008Response/Objection - Motion to submit case on expedited docketResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
09/12/2008Event - Hardcopy received objection to appellant's motion for submission of case without oral argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/16/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, eight volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Binders; Volume V, Deposition & Transcripts; Volume VI, exhibits; Volume VII, Binder; Volume VIII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Davidson and Rebecca Winkler for appellant Morris.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2008Order - Denying motion for submission of case without oral argumentOrderDenyFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Thomas F. Reese for appellee CMS Oil and Gas CompanyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2008Order - Other - emergency order allowing four justices to hear oral argument, Justice Kite unavailableOrderOtherFinal
10/20/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke (Patrick G. Davidson and Rebecca Lynn Winkler for appellant Morris; Thomas Reese for appellee CMS) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/25/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part, Justice Kite writing for the Court with Justice Golden filing a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for 4/14/10ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal