judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERGSTROM VS. DAHL

Case Information: 38234
Short Caption:BERGSTROM VS. DAHLCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 39051
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A425009Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/07/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12656
07/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/03/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Steve L. Bergstrom--Travelers Express Money Order No. 3705994093.
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-13793
08/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal for Lack of Jurisdiction. 01-14225
08/28/2001MotionFiled Motion. Joinder in Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. 01-14554
09/07/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 through 3. 01-15115
09/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/25/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The complaint as to Kincaid and Kincaid's counterclaim against appellant remain pending in district court. fn1[We note that Kincaid is not properly a respondent in this appeal, and direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption on this court's docket to reflect the caption on this order.] We grant respondent Brown's motion and "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-16137
10/23/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 3 this day. 01-16550
10/23/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 5, 2001. 01-16550