judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

HOUSTON LADDER MANUFACTURING COMPANY v. SLATS-O-WOOD AWNING COMPANY, INC.

Case: A-2682
A-2682
05/02/1950
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON LADDER MANUFACTURING COMPANY
SLATS-O-WOOD AWNING COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/27/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/26/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/14/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/29/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/26/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/20/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/27/1950Response to Brief filed
06/26/1950Brief in Support of Petition
06/14/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1950Response to Brief filed
05/26/1950Brief in Support of Petition
05/20/1950Response to Petition
05/02/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/02/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Slats-o-Wood Awning Company, Inc.Respondent
Houston Ladder Manufacturing CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information