judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Case Heading (S-08-0098)
Case Number:S-08-0098Case Docketed On:05/09/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Taxation and Revenue (Title 39)
Short Title:EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Full Title:EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantExxon Mobil CorporationPatrick Reed Day
Walter F. Eggers III
Brent R. Kunz
AppelleeDepartment of RevenueBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Martin L. Hardsocg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation - Mineral
Opinion Number:2009 WY 139
Citation:219 P.3d 128

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/09/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/09/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
05/09/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/09/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
05/20/2008Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
07/03/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellant and statement of costs. Called counsel and asked for replacement pages with original signature of counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/05/2008Brief - Petitioner reply (submitted as Petitioner reply, should have been submitted as Appellant reply).BriefPetitioner replyFinal
09/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's reply brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/19/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, thirty-seven volumes. Volume I, Original papers; Volume II, (3 Boxes) State Board of Equalization Record; Box 1, volumes 1-14; Box 2, volumes 15-24; Box 3, volumes 25-37.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/22/2008Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Martin Hardsocg for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Pat Day for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/26/2008Order - Assignment of judge Keith G. Kautz to act in this matter (Justice Kite recused)OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
10/22/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Voigt, Justices Golden, Hill and Burke, and Judge Kautz (Patrick Reed Day, Walter F. Eggers, III and Brent R. Kunz, argument by Mr. Day for appellant; Martin L. Hardsocg, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/12/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the Court. Justice Hill filed a dissenting opinion.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/01/2009Record - Record returned to district court (Agency Record - 3 boxes - picked up by Wendy Soto for the State Board of Equalization)RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/01/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/07/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - District Court record signed for 12/3/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal