judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HENRY TODD ATKINSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKS

Case Information: 10-AA-1255
Short Caption:HENRY TODD ATKINSON V. D.C. DEP'T OF PUBLIC WORKSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Public Works
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PWVK168927-09Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/27/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerHenry Todd Atkinson NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Public WorksN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/13/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/14/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD,OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
10/21/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/27/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ 1/19/10 hearing
06/27/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/30/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
08/23/2011FiledOrder directing motion, brief and appendix
09/20/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
09/20/2011FiledDismissed
10/21/2011FiledMandate