judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID DALE BAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0094)
Case Number:S-08-0094Case Docketed On:05/06/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:DAVID DALE BAKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAVID DALE BAKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid Dale BakerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2010 WY 6
Citation:223 P.3d 542

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/23/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/23/2008Event - Hardcopy received and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/04/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/06/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/27/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volumes III-IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Reports; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/20/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/04/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
02/04/2010Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
02/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/25/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/25/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/25/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/02/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/1/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
05/24/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for writ of certiorari filedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal
10/07/2010Notice-Incoming - U.S. Supreme Court - Petition for Writ of Certiorari deniedNotice-IncomingU.S. Supreme CourtFinal