judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CAP CITY V. D.C. FIRE & EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES

Case Information: 10-AA-1256
Short Caption:CAP CITY V. D.C. FIRE & EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICESClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Fire & Emergency Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEIW101045-09Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/17/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerCap City N
John J. HathwayNN
RespondentDistrict of Columbia Fire & Medical Emergency SvcsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
10/13/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
10/14/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
10/21/2010 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
03/17/2011RECORD ON APPEAL
03/17/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/21/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
05/16/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 21, 2011, directing petitioner to file the brief and the appendix within 40 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this petition for review to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC)
06/13/2011ORDER: This appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
06/13/2011DISMISSED
07/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED