judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NICOLAS CHRISTOPHER COUNTS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0095)
Case Number:S-08-0095Case Docketed On:05/06/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:NICOLAS CHRISTOPHER COUNTS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:NICOLAS CHRISTOPHER COUNTS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNicolas Christopher CountsDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 156
Citation:197 P.3d 1280

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/06/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/19/2008Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - order appointing State Public DefenderRulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
06/19/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/19/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of time to file appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/19/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/03/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/03/2008Event - Hardcopy received and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/13/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/14/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2008Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/12/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/12/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and takenunder advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/31/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/16/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/16/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/16/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal