judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCELROY (DANNY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38231
Short Caption:MCELROY (DANNY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C119103Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/10/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/26/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/26/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12646
09/04/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal (including any prefiously prepared transcripts) due: 120 days. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-14860
09/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order, and Notice of Entry of Order, filed in district court on: 8/16/01. 01-15584
12/10/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-20702
12/10/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/10/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn12[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02M-WM/DA/ML 02-06353
05/07/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-06528
05/07/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 10, 2002. 02-06528