judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARLOS PEREZ LIRA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0100)
Case Number:S-08-0100Case Docketed On:05/16/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CARLOS PEREZ LIRA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CARLOS PEREZ LIRA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarlos Perez LiraTom Sedar
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Nicole Georgette Krieger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/16/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/16/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/16/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/16/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/26/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/26/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/04/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/05/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2008Notice-Incoming - Attorney substitution - Nichole Krieger to appear as Special Assistant Attorney General for the State of Wyoming in this matter.Notice-IncomingAttorney substitutionFinal
09/17/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee, notice of designation of special limited assistant attorney general for limited purpose and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/10/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal