judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LILLIE M. MIDDLEBROOKS V. MEDSTAR HEALTH INC., ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1276
Short Caption:LILLIE M. MIDDLEBROOKS V. MEDSTAR HEALTH INC., ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5230-10Filed Date:10/15/2010

Opening Event Date:10/15/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/22/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLillie M. Middlebrooks NPro SeN
AppelleeMedstar Health Inc.NPro SeN
AppelleeWashington Hospital CenterNPro SeN
AppelleeCarol Jedrzejek NPro SeN
AppelleeAngala Johnson NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/18/2010FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
11/03/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction as having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER. See DC Code 11-721 (2001). (BY: ETW)
11/03/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
11/18/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated
11/18/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE -dated 11/3/10
11/30/2010 ORDERED that THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED as having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER. Any challenge to the removal order should be filed in the U.S. District Court of Columbia. (OBNBKG) (rm)
11/30/2010DISMISSED
12/22/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived