judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAXEN (GARRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38230
Short Caption:SAXEN (GARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR94P2786Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/25/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12619
07/25/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/24/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-14362
10/11/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-17162
10/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17302
10/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2001. 01-17302